Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | File Number 263 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 144 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/24/2019 | Vote to Draft |