Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Special Act 19-15
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
House Calendar Number 690
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9792
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9084
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
File Number 218
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 114
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|