Senate | 03/21/2019 | File Number 100 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 67 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2019 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Drafted by Committee |