Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Public Act 19-110
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
House Calendar Number 562
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8394
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
File Number 856
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 452
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|