Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | File Number 101 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 68 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2019 | Vote to Draft |