Senate | 06/26/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Public Act 19-29 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | House Calendar Number 512 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | File Number 635 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 304 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/11/2019 | Vote to Draft |