Senate | 05/24/2019 | House Calendar Number 658 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | File Number 719 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 330 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Vote to Draft |