House | 06/03/2019 | House Calendar Number 716 | ||
House | 06/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 06/03/2019 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 06/03/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10470 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | File Number 831 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 432 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Public Hearing 03/29 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Vote to Draft |