Senate | 04/29/2019 | House Calendar Number 513 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7537 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | File Number 445 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 208 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Vote to Draft |