Senate | 05/13/2019 | House Calendar Number 576 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8481 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | File Number 833 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 433 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Public Hearing 04/01 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Vote to Draft |