Senate | 04/29/2019 | House Calendar Number 514 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 7536 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7536 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | File Number 516 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 260 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |