Senate | 04/08/2019 | File Number 517 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 266 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Drafted by Committee |