Senate | 04/02/2019 | File Number 317 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 158 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 02/13/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Vote to Draft |