Senate | 05/30/2019 | House Calendar Number 674 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8637 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9542 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | File Number 857 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 453 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Public Hearing 03/29 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Vote to Draft |