Senate | 04/08/2019 | File Number 518 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 252 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 02/26/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Vote to Draft |