Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | File Number 40 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 39 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/27/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/13/2019 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |