Senate | 07/08/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Public Act 19-83 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | House Calendar Number 552 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | File Number 58 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 53 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |