Senate | 05/14/2019 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | File Number 451 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 204 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |