Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Public Act 19-57
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
House Calendar Number 695
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10111
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
File Number 76
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 63
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|