Senate | 03/19/2019 | File Number 77 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 64 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |