Senate | 07/08/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Public Act 19-94 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | House Calendar Number 467 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | File Number 522 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 240 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |