Senate | 05/22/2019 | House Calendar Number 648 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 9076 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8246 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | File Number 721 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 359 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |