Senate | 07/08/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Public Act 19-95 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | House Calendar Number 578 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | File Number 228 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 136 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |