Senate | 03/19/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |