Senate | 03/25/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |