Senate | 03/28/2019 | File Number 229 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 115 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |