Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Public Act 19-59
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
House Calendar Number 677
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9747
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
File Number 836
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 437
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|