House
|
06/28/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Public Act 19-124
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B,C
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House Calendar Number 734
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 11064
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 10659
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 11064
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
File Number 724
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 350
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|