Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Public Act 19-3
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
House Calendar Number 515
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7541
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
File Number 230
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 120
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|