Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00895 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/20/2019

                                
 
LCO No. 4635  	1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 895  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 4635 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ME DICAID COVERAGE OF IN-HOME 
COUNSELING PROVIDED BY A HOME HEALTH CAR E AGENCY. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 17b-242 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 2 
1, 2019): 3 
(a) The Department of Social Services shall determine the rates to be 4 
paid to home health care agencies and homemaker-home health aide 5 
agencies by the state or any town in the state for persons aided or 6 
cared for by the state or any such town. [For the period from February 7 
1, 1991, to January 31, 1992, inclusive, payment for each service to the 8 
state shall be based upon the rate for such service as determined by the 9 
Office of Health Care Access, except that for those providers whose 10 
Medicaid rates for the year ending January 31, 1991, exceed the median 11 
rate, no increase shall be allowed. For those providers whose rates for 12 
the year ending January 31, 1991, are below the median rate, increases 13 
shall not exceed the lower of the prior rate increased by the most 14 
recent annual increase in the consumer price index for urban 15  Raised Bill No.  895 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4635   	2 of 3 
 
consumers or the median rate. In no case shall any such rate exceed the 16 
eightieth percentile of rates in effect January 31, 1991, nor shall any rate 17 
exceed the charge to the general public for similar services. Rates 18 
effective February 1, 1992, shall be based upon rates as determined by 19 
the Office of Health Care Access, except that increases shall not exceed 20 
the prior year's rate increased by the most recent annual increase in the 21 
consumer price index for urban consumers and rates effective 22 
February 1, 1992, shall remain in effect through June 30, 1993. Rates 23 
effective July 1, 1993, shall be based upon rates as determined by the 24 
Office of Health Care Access except if the Medicaid rates for any 25 
service for the period ending June 30, 1993, exceed the median rate for 26 
such service, the increase effective July 1, 1993, shall not exceed one 27 
per cent. If the Medicaid rate for any service for the period ending June 28 
30, 1993, is below the median rate, the increase effective July 1, 1993, 29 
shall not exceed the lower of the prior rate increased by one and one-30 
half times the most recent annual increase in the consumer price index 31 
for urban consumers or the median rate plus one per cent.] The 32 
Commissioner of Social Services shall establish a fee schedule for home 33 
health services to be effective on and after July 1, 1994. The 34 
commissioner may annually modify such fee schedule if such 35 
modification is needed to ensure that the conversion to an 36 
administrative services organization is cost neutral to home health care 37 
agencies and homemaker-home health aide agencies in the aggregate 38 
and ensures patient access. Utilization may be a factor in determining 39 
cost neutrality. The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule for 40 
home health services provided under the Connecticut home-care 41 
program for the elderly established under section 17b-342, effective 42 
July 1, 2000, by two per cent over the fee schedule for home health 43 
services for the previous year. The commissioner may increase any fee 44 
payable to a home health care agency or homemaker-home health aide 45 
agency upon the application of such an agency evidencing 46 
extraordinary costs related to (1) serving persons with AIDS; (2) high-47 
risk maternal and child health care; (3) escort services; or (4) extended 48 
hour services. In no case shall any rate or fee exceed the charge to the 49 
general public for similar services. The commissioner shall include in 50  Raised Bill No.  895 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4635   	3 of 3 
 
the fee schedule rates to be paid under the medical assistance program 51 
for behavioral health counseling provided to a medical assistance 52 
beneficiary in his or her home by a social worker employed by a home 53 
health care agency who is licensed pursuant to chapter 383b. A home 54 
health care agency or homemaker-home health aide agency which, due 55 
to any material change in circumstances, is aggrieved by a rate 56 
determined pursuant to this subsection may, within ten days of receipt 57 
of written notice of such rate from the Commissioner of Social Services, 58 
request in writing a hearing on all items of aggrievement. The 59 
commissioner shall, upon the receipt of all documentation necessary to 60 
evaluate the request, determine whether there has been such a change 61 
in circumstances and shall conduct a hearing if appropriate. The 62 
Commissioner of Social Services shall adopt regulations, in accordance 63 
with chapter 54, to implement the provisions of this subsection. The 64 
commissioner may implement policies and procedures to carry out the 65 
provisions of this subsection while in the process of adopting 66 
regulations, provided notice of intent to adopt the regulations is 67 
[published in the Connecticut Law Journal not later than twenty days 68 
after the date of] posted on the eRegulations System prior to the date 69 
of adopting the regulations and implementing the policies and 70 
procedures. Such policies and procedures shall be valid for not longer 71 
than nine months. 72 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 17b-242(a) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To provide Medicaid coverage for behavioral counseling provided to 
Medicaid beneficiaries in their homes by licensed social workers 
employed by home health care agencies. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]