Senate | 04/18/2019 | File Number 760 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 368 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/11/2019 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |