Senate | 04/25/2019 | File Number 797 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 389 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Public Hearing 04/01 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |