Senate | 07/01/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Public Act 19-97 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | House Calendar Number 508 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | File Number 231 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 129 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |