Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Public Act 19-120
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House Calendar Number 664
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 8446
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9364
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
File Number 139
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 90
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|