Senate | 05/16/2019 | File Number 898 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 489 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |