Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00944 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/26/2019

                                
 
LCO No. 4906  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 944  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 4906 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E PROVISION OF SERVICES TO 
CHILDREN BY OCCUPATI ONAL THERAPISTS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) An occupational 1 
therapist, licensed pursuant to section 20-74b or 20-74c of the general 2 
statutes and providing services on a fee schedule to children enrolled 3 
in HUSKY A, may enroll as an independent Medicaid provider and 4 
bill the medical assistance program for providing self -care 5 
management and motor skills therapy to such children. The 6 
Commissioner of Social Services shall provide reimbursement under 7 
the independent group fee schedule for such therapy and shall make 8 
any necessary changes in the Medicaid state plan to provide such 9 
reimbursement. 10 
(b) The Commissioner of Social Services, in consultation with the 11 
Commissioner of Early Childhood, shall (1) compensate each local or 12 
regional board of education and occupational therapists providing 13 
Medicaid-eligible services as part of the birth-to-three program, as 14 
described in section 17a-248 of the general statutes, at the rate of the 15  Raised Bill No.  944 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4906   	2 of 4 
 
independent group fee schedule, (2) require occupational therapists to 16 
conduct quarterly audits by submitting documentation verifying that 17 
clients appeared for treatment and any billing associated with such 18 
treatment, and (3) provide annual training to occupational therapists 19 
concerning any new billing requirements. 20 
Sec. 2. Section 17a-106e of the general statutes is repealed and the 21 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 22 
(a) (1) [On and after October 1, 2013, the] The Department of 23 
Children and Families shall, within available appropriations, ensure 24 
that each child thirty-six months of age or younger who has been 25 
substantiated as a victim of abuse or neglect is screened for both 26 
developmental and social-emotional delays using [validated 27 
assessment tools such as the Ages and Stages and] the Ages and 28 
Stages-Social/Emotional Questionnaires. [, or their equivalents.] The 29 
department shall ensure that such screenings are administered to any 30 
such child twice annually. [, unless such child has been found to be 31 
eligible for the birth-to-three program, established under section 17a-32 
248b.] 33 
(2) [On and after July 1, 2015, the] The department shall ensure that 34 
each child thirty-six months of age or younger who is being served 35 
through the department's family assessment response program, 36 
established under section 17a-101g, is screened for both developmental 37 
and social-emotional delays using [validated assessment tools such as] 38 
the Ages and Stages and the Ages and Stages-Social/Emotional 39 
Questionnaires. [, or their equivalents, unless such child has been 40 
found to be eligible for the birth-to-three program.] 41 
(b) The department shall refer any child exhibiting developmental 42 
or social-emotional delays pursuant to such screenings to the birth-to-43 
three program. The department shall refer any child who is not found 44 
eligible for services under the birth-to-three program to the Help Me 45 
Grow prevention program under the Office of Early Childhood, 46 
pursuant to section 17b-751d, or a similar program that the department 47  Raised Bill No.  944 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4906   	3 of 4 
 
deems appropriate. 48 
(c) Not later than July 1, 2014, and annually thereafter, the 49 
department shall submit, in accordance with the provisions of section 50 
11-4a, a report to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly 51 
having cognizance of matters relating to children for inclusion in the 52 
annual report card prepared pursuant to section 2-53m on the status of 53 
the screening and referral program authorized pursuant to subsection 54 
(a) of this section. Such report shall include: (1) The number of children 55 
thirty-six months of age or younger within the state who have been 56 
substantiated as victims of abuse or neglect within the preceding 57 
twelve months; (2) the number of children thirty-six months of age or 58 
younger within the state who have been served through the 59 
department's family assessment response program within the 60 
preceding twelve months; (3) the number of children who were 61 
screened for developmental and social-emotional delays pursuant to 62 
subsection (a) of this section by the department or by a provider 63 
contracted by the department within the preceding twelve months; (4) 64 
the number of children in subdivisions (1) and (2) of this subsection 65 
referred for evaluation under the birth-to-three program within the 66 
preceding twelve months, the number of such children actually 67 
evaluated under such program, the number of such children found 68 
eligible for services under such program and the services for which 69 
such children were found eligible under such program; and (5) the 70 
number of children described in subdivisions (1) and (2) of this 71 
subsection receiving evidence-based developmental support services 72 
through the birth-to-three program or through a provider contracted 73 
by the department within the preceding twelve months. 74 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2019 17a-106e 
  Raised Bill No.  944 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4906   	4 of 4 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To change the Medicaid reimbursement methodology for occupational 
therapists and to require certain screening tools be used to assess 
children involved in substantiated cases of abuse and neglect. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]