Senate | 03/26/2019 | File Number 169 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 95 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |