Senate | 06/01/2019 | House Calendar Number 709 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10278 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | File Number 374 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 188 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |