Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00963 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2019

                                
 
LCO No. 5009  	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 963  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5009 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND 
EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HED)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CO ORDINATION BETWEEN NORWALK 
COMMUNITY COLLEGE AN D J. M. WRIGHT TECHNICAL HIGH 
SCHOOL. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 10a-72h of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 2 
(a) On or before September 1, 2009, the [Board of Trustees of the 3 
Community-Technical Colleges] Board of Regents for Higher 4 
Education shall appoint and convene an oversight board for the 5 
purposes of carrying out the provisions of subsection (b) of this 6 
section. Such board shall include: (1) A representative of the faculty of 7 
Norwalk Community College; (2) a representative of the faculty of the 8 
J. M. Wright Technical High School; (3) four representatives from trade 9 
vocations; (4) two representatives of the business community; and (5) a 10 
representative of a chamber of commerce. The president of Norwalk 11 
Community College shall serve as the oversight board's chairperson. 12 
(b) On or before January 1, 2010, the oversight board established 13  Raised Bill No.  963 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5009   	2 of 2 
 
pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, in consultation with the 14 
[Board of Trustees of the Community-Technical Colleges] Board of 15 
Regents for Higher Education and the Commissioner of Education, 16 
shall establish, within existing budgetary resources and staffing levels, 17 
a pilot program to operate during the school year commencing July 1, 18 
2010, and each school year thereafter, to allow students to complete 19 
courses at the J. M. Wright Technical High School for college credit at 20 
Norwalk Community College. Such program shall coordinate courses 21 
between the J. M. Wright Technical High School and Norwalk 22 
Community College and provide students with access to vocational 23 
employment or postsecondary education. 24 
(c) On or before June 30, 2011, and annually thereafter, the Board of 25 
Trustees of the Community-Technical Colleges and the Commissioner 26 
of Education shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 27 
11-4a, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having 28 
cognizance of matters relating to education and higher education and 29 
employment advancement on the curriculum offered as part of the 30 
pilot program, [and] the number of students who have earned course 31 
credit under the program established in subsection (b) of this section, a 32 
plan for the expansion of the pilot program at J. M. Wright Technical 33 
High School and recommendations for the implementation of similar 34 
programs at other high schools in the state.  35 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 10a-72h 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To consider expansion of the pilot program for coordination between 
Norwalk Community College and J. M. Wright Technical High School. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]