Senate | 04/26/2019 | House Calendar Number 509 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 7188 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7462 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7188 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | File Number 376 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 198 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |