Senate | 04/04/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 213 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | File Number 455 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |