Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Public Act 19-20
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,K
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule K
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
House Calendar Number 608
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,K
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule K 8756
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule J 8330
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule I 8668
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 7502
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 7518
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 7503
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 7494
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8628
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8630
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8439
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7531
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
File Number 535
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 244
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|