House
|
07/08/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Public Act 19-132
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House Calendar Number 730
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10697
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
File Number 841
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 442
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|