House | 06/05/2019 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | House Calendar Number 735 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 11059 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | File Number 599 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 286 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |