Senate | 04/09/2019 | File Number 569 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 281 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |