House | 06/03/2019 | House Calendar Number 720 | ||
House | 06/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 06/03/2019 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | File Number 637 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 312 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |