Senate | 03/29/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |