Senate | 05/08/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Public Act 19-2 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | House Calendar Number 475 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | File Number 458 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 209 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |