Senate | 05/20/2019 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | File Number 730 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 337 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |