Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01071 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-01071-R01-
4-SB.docx
5-1 of 3
3+LCO No. 5936 1 of 3
64
7-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 1071
5+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1071
86 January Session, 2019
7+LCO No. 5936
8+
9+
10+Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
11+
12+
13+Introduced by:
14+(PD)
15+
916
1017
1118
1219 AN ACT CONCERNING AG ING IN PLACE INCENTIVES.
1320 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
1421 Assembly convened:
1522
1623 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2019) (a) As used in this 1
1724 section: 2
1825 (1) "Qualified individual" means an individual with a household 3
1926 income of not more than one hundred fifty thousand dollars for the 4
2027 taxable year commencing on or after January 1, 2020; 5
2128 (2) "Retrofit" means to make changes to a residence that (A) are 6
2229 necessary to ensure the health, welfare and safety of a qualified 7
2330 individual, (B) increase the visitability of such residence, (C) enable 8
2431 greater accessibility and independence for such qualified individual in 9
2532 such residence, (D) are required due to an illness, impairment or 10
2633 disability of such qualified individual, and (E) allow such qualified 11
2734 individual to age in place; and 12
2835 (3) "Visitability" means a residence's ease of access for persons with 13
29-disabilities. 14
36+disabilities. 14 Raised Bill No. 1071
37+
38+
39+
40+LCO No. 5936 2 of 3
41+
3042 (b) (1) Except as provided in subdivision (3) of this subsection, for 15
3143 taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2020, but prior to 16
3244 January 1, 2025, there shall be a credit allowed against the tax imposed 17
3345 under chapter 229 of the general statutes for any qualified individual 18
34-who retrofits, or employs a person or business to retrofit, such 19 Substitute Bill No. 1071
35-
36-
37-LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-01071-
38-R01-SB.docx }
39-2 of 3
40-
46+who retrofits, or employs a person or business to retrofit, such 19
4147 qualified individual's residence and who owns such residence. The 20
4248 credit shall be in an amount equal to the costs of retrofitting such 21
4349 residence or five thousand dollars, whichever is less. Such qualified 22
4450 individual shall claim the credit in the taxable year in which such 23
4551 retrofitting occurred by including the certificate issued pursuant to 24
4652 subdivision (2) of this subsection with such qualified individual's 25
4753 income tax return filed with the Commissioner of Revenue Services. 26
4854 (2) The Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall issue 27
49-a certificate to any qualified individual who retrofits a residence in 28
55+a certificate to any qualified individuals who retrofits a residence in 28
5056 accordance with subdivision (1) of this subsection, upon the request of 29
5157 such qualified individual. Such certificate shall identify the taxpayer 30
5258 and certify that such qualified individual satisfies the requirements of 31
5359 said subdivision. The secretary shall issue such certificates in the order 32
5460 in which they are requested. 33
5561 (3) The Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall track 34
5662 each certificate issued pursuant to subdivision (2) of this subsection in 35
5763 each taxable year and, upon the total amount of such certificates issued 36
5864 equaling one million dollars in such taxable year, shall not issue any 37
5965 further such certificate in such taxable year. 38
6066 (c) The amount of the credit allowed to any qualified individual 39
6167 pursuant to this section shall not exceed the amount of tax due from 40
6268 such qualified individual under chapter 229 of the general statutes 41
6369 with respect to the taxable year in which such credit is being claimed. 42
6470 Any such credit claimed by such qualified individual but not applied 43
6571 against the tax due under said chapter may be carried forward for the 44
6672 five immediately succeeding taxable years until the full credit has been 45
67-applied. 46
73+applied. 46 Raised Bill No. 1071
74+
75+
76+
77+LCO No. 5936 3 of 3
78+
6879 (d) Not later than January 1, 2021, and annually thereafter until 47
6980 January 1, 2024, the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management 48
7081 shall submit to the Commissioner of Revenue Services a report of each 49
7182 taxpayer to whom the secretary has issued a certificate pursuant to 50
72-subdivision (2) of subsection (b) of this section for the prior taxable 51 Substitute Bill No. 1071
73-
74-
75-LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-01071-
76-R01-SB.docx }
77-3 of 3
78-
79-year, which report shall include (1) the name of each such taxpayer, (2) 52
80-the Social Security number or federal employer identification number, 53
81-and (3) the amount of the tax credit allocated. 54
83+subdivision (2) of subsection (c) of this act for the prior taxable year, 51
84+which report shall include (1) the name of each such taxpayer, (2) the 52
85+Social Security number or federal employee identification number, and 53
86+(3) the amount of the tax credit allocated. 54
8287 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
8388 sections:
8489
8590 Section 1 October 1, 2019 New section
8691
87-Statement of Legislative Commissioners:
88-In Subsec. (d), "subsection (c) of this act" was changed to "subsection
89-(b) of this section" for accuracy and "employee" was changed to
90-"employer" for accuracy.
91-
92-PD Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO
92+Statement of Purpose:
93+To provide a state income tax credit to taxpayers who incur costs
94+retrofitting a residence for purposes of allowing an individual to age in
95+place.
96+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline,
97+except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is
98+not underlined.]
9399